ND SB2262 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Signed by Governor 04/07
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Signed by Governor 04/07
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 19-20.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to fertilizer regulation by cities, counties, or townships.
Title
Fertilizer regulation by cities, counties, or townships.
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Wanzek [R] | Sen. Jerry Klein [R] | Sen. Jim Dotzenrod [D] | Rep. Craig Headland [R] |
Rep. Dennis Johnson [R] | Rep. Wayne Trottier [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/07 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Concurred |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2017-03-22 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 82 nays 11 |
2017-03-21 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-20 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 1 2 |
2017-03-14 | House | Rereferred to Agriculture |
2017-03-13 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-10 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2 |
2017-03-02 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 1 |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |