ND 2261 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-08 - Committee Hearing 02:00
Pending: Joint Industry, Business, and Labor Committee
Hearing: Mar 8 @ 2:00 am in Industry, Business and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 43-10.1-01 and 43-10.1-03.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to irrevocable itemized funeral contracts and Medicaid assets exempt for funeral expenses; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Irrevocable itemized funeral contracts and Medicaid assets exempt for funeral expenses; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-08HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2021-02-19HouseIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
2021-02-01HouseReceived from Senate
2021-01-29SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
2021-01-28SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-01-27SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2021-01-26SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2021-01-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback