ND 2261 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 16.1-03-01, 16.1-03-02, 16.1-03-03, and 16.1-03-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the organization of political parties and caucuses within legislative districts; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The organization of political parties and caucuses within legislative districts; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-10SenateSigned by Governor 04/10
2017-04-05SenateSent to Governor
2017-04-04SenateSigned by President
2017-04-04HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-03SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
2017-04-03SenateConcurred
2017-03-30SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2017-03-29HouseEmergency clause carried
2017-03-29HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 83 nays 9
2017-03-28HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-27HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 1
2017-03-16HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-03-01HouseIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
2017-02-14HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-13SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
2017-02-10SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-09SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 1
2017-01-27SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-01-16SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback