ND SB2261 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 16.1-03-01, 16.1-03-02, 16.1-03-03, and 16.1-03-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the organization of political parties and caucuses within legislative districts; and to declare an emergency.
Title
The organization of political parties and caucuses within legislative districts; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Janne Myrdal [R] | Sen. David Clemens [R] | Sen. Shawn Vedaa [R] | Rep. James Kasper [R] |
Rep. Ben Koppelman [R] | Rep. Kim Koppelman [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/10 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Concurred |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2017-03-29 | House | Emergency clause carried |
2017-03-29 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 83 nays 9 |
2017-03-28 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-27 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 1 |
2017-03-16 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2017-02-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 1 |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |