ND 2258 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Returned to Senate (12)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact chapter 57-39.9 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to state-tribal agreements for the administration and collection of sales, use, and gross receipts taxes within the boundaries of the Fort Berthold Reservation, Lake Traverse Reservation, Spirit Lake Reservation, Standing Rock Reservation, or Turtle Mountain Reservation; to repeal chapter 57-39.8 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a state-tribal agreement with the Standing Rock Sioux Tribe; to provide a continuing appropriation; to provide for application; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A state-tribal agreement with the Standing Rock Sioux Tribe; to provide a continuing appropriation; to provide for application; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 77 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2019-03-20HouseEmergency clause carried
2019-03-20HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 77 nays 15
2019-03-20HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-03-19HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0
2019-03-05HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2019-02-27HouseIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Finance and Taxation Committee
2019-02-15HouseReceived from Senate
2019-02-14SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
2019-02-14SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-02-13SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 1
2019-02-06SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2019-01-14SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback