ND 2257 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 36
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subdivision a of subsection 1 of section 40-47-01.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to extraterritorial zoning.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extraterritorial zoning.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 9 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-21SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 36
2017-02-20SenateReported back without recommendation 6 0 0
2017-02-03SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-16SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback