ND 2254 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-25 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 43
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subsection to section 57-39.2-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a sales and use tax exemption for sales of tampons and sanitary napkins; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A sales and use tax exemption for sales of tampons and sanitary napkins; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 3 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-25SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 43
2017-01-24SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-01-23SenateCommittee Hearing 11:00
2017-01-16SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback