ND 2253 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study relating to the long-term care insurance market.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study relating to the long-term care insurance market.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13SenateSigned by Governor 04/12
2021-04-09SenateSent to Governor
2021-04-09SenateSigned by President
2021-04-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-07SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1
2021-04-07SenateConcurred
2021-03-23SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2021-03-22HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 90 nays 2
2021-03-17HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-03-16HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 0 3
2021-03-03HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-02-19HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
2021-02-11HouseReceived from Senate
2021-02-10SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1
2021-02-10SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-09SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
2021-02-09SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2021-02-04SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2021-02-04SenateAmendment adopted
2021-02-03SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2021-01-26SenateCommittee Hearing 08:30
2021-01-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback