ND 2253 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Signed by Governor 03/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new subsection to section 12.1-32-15 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to international travel reporting requirements for registered offenders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

International travel reporting requirements for registered offenders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateSigned by Governor 03/14
2019-03-13SenateSent to Governor
2019-03-13SenateSigned by President
2019-03-13HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-12SenateReturned to Senate
2019-03-11HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 1
2019-03-06HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 1 1
2019-03-06HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-02-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2019-01-23HouseReceived from Senate
2019-01-22SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2019-01-21SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2019-01-21SenateCommittee Hearing 11:00
2019-01-14SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback