ND SB2253 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Signed by Governor 04/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Signed by Governor 04/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 47-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to transfers of land between any federal, state, or local governmental entities; and to provide for retroactive application.
Title
Transfers of land between any federal, state, or local governmental entities; and to provide for retroactive application.
Sponsors
Sen. Jessica Unruh Bell [R] | Sen. Jordan Kannianen [R] | Sen. David Rust [R] | Rep. Jeff Delzer [R] |
Rep. Keith Kempenich [R] | Rep. Vicky Steiner [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 40 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 40 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/17 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-12 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 89 nays 0 |
2017-04-12 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2017-04-10 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2017-04-04 | House | Conference committee appointed Beadle Pyle Toman |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Burckhard Kannianen Dotzenrod |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2017-03-24 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 91 nays 1 |
2017-03-22 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-21 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 2 1 |
2017-03-16 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 40 nays 5 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 1 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |