ND SB2253 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 23 nays 70
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 23 nays 70
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the department of human services for expanding the healthy families home visitation program.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the department of human services for expanding the healthy families home visitation program.
Sponsors
Sen. Judy Lee [R] | Sen. Kelly Armstrong [R] | Sen. Karen Krebsbach [R] | Sen. John Warner [D] |
Rep. Lois Delmore [D] | Rep. Alan Fehr [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 23 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 27 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 27 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 23 nays 70 |
2015-03-31 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 4 0 |
2015-03-09 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2015-02-25 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2015-02-24 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 27 nays 19 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 3 0 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |