ND 2250 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Committee Hearing 02:30
Pending: Joint Education Committee
Hearing: Feb 27 @ 2:30 am in Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 15.1-37-06 and 15.1-37-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the receipt and distribution of free and reduced lunch grant funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The receipt and distribution of free and reduced lunch grant funds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27HouseCommittee Hearing 02:30
2019-02-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
2019-02-13HouseReceived from Senate
2019-02-12SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0
2019-02-11SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
2019-02-11SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-02-05SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2019-02-05SenateAmendment adopted
2019-02-04SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2019-01-23SenateCommittee Hearing 09:45
2019-01-14SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback