ND SB2250 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 15.1-37-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to early childhood education programs.
Title
Early childhood education programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Nicole Poolman [R] | Sen. Tom Campbell [R] | Sen. Joan Heckaman [D] | Rep. Cynthia Schreiber-Beck [R] |
Rep. Lois Delmore [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/10 |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Concurred |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2017-04-03 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 81 nays 8 |
2017-04-03 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-31 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 20 0 1 |
2017-03-20 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2017-03-20 | House | Amendment adopted |
2017-03-20 | House | Division B adopted |
2017-03-20 | House | Division A lost |
2017-03-20 | House | Division of amendment |
2017-03-17 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0 |
2017-03-06 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |