ND SB2249 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/31
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/31
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 57-51.1-07.5 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to deposits of the state's share of oil and gas taxes; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Deposits of the state's share of oil and gas taxes; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Heitkamp [R] | Sen. Joan Heckaman [D] | Rep. Sebastian Ertelt [R] | Rep. Scott Louser [R] |
Rep. Kathy Skroch [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 65 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/31 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2021-03-23 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 65 nays 29 |
2021-03-17 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 8 6 0 |
2021-03-16 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-03-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |