ND 2248 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Signed by Governor 04/05
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new subsection to section 14-15-19 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to relinquishment and termination of parent and child relationship.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relinquishment and termination of parent and child relationship.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-06SenateSigned by Governor 04/05
2017-04-03SenateSent to Governor
2017-04-03SenateSigned by President
2017-04-03HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-31SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 0
2017-03-31SenateConcurred
2017-03-28SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2017-03-27HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 83 nays 9
2017-03-23HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-22HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 15 0 0
2017-03-08HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-02-20HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2017-02-17HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-02SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2017-02-01SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2017-02-01SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-01-16SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback