ND 2247 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Signed by Governor 04/27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 47-10-02.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to property disclosure requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property disclosure requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-28SenateSigned by Governor 04/27
2021-04-23SenateSent to Governor
2021-04-23SenateSigned by President
2021-04-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-22HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 91 nays 1
2021-04-22HouseConference committee report adopted
2021-04-21HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2021-04-21SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2021-04-21SenateConference committee report adopted
2021-04-21SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2021-04-13HouseConference committee appointed Louser D. Ruby Adams
2021-04-09SenateConference committee appointed Burckhard Larson Kannianen
2021-04-09SenateRefused to concur
2021-03-30SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2021-03-29HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 93 nays 1
2021-03-26HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-03-25HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
2021-03-16HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-02-24HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
2021-02-02HouseReceived from Senate
2021-02-01SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2021-01-29SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
2021-01-29SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2021-01-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback