ND 2246 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/31
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 12.1-32-02 and sections 19-03.1-23 and 39-08-01.5 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to drug court and the creation of a veterans treatment docket.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Drug court and the creation of a veterans treatment docket.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01SenateSigned by Governor 03/31
2021-03-30SenateSent to Governor
2021-03-30SenateSigned by President
2021-03-29HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-26SenateReturned to Senate
2021-03-25HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 6
2021-03-22HouseLaid over one legislative day
2021-03-19HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1
2021-03-17HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2021-02-23HouseRereferred to Judiciary
2021-02-23HouseRequest return from committee
2021-02-19HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
2021-01-29HouseReceived from Senate
2021-01-28SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 40 nays 6
2021-01-27SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
2021-01-25SenateCommittee Hearing 02:30
2021-01-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback