ND SB2243 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 3 of section 50-24.6-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to prior authorization for medical assistance.
Title
Prior authorization for medical assistance.
Sponsors
Sen. Judy Lee [R] | Sen. Howard Anderson [R] | Sen. Curtiss Kreun [R] | Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] |
Rep. Mary Johnson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 67 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 67 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/08 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Concurred |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2019-03-25 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 67 nays 23 |
2019-03-21 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-20 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0 |
2019-03-04 | House | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |