ND 2243 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 47
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study of teacher loan forgiveness programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study of teacher loan forgiveness programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 0 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 0 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 76 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-21SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 47
2017-04-21SenateConference committee report adopted
2017-04-21SenateReported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede)
2017-04-10HouseConference committee appointed Owens M. Ruby Mock
2017-04-04SenateConference committee appointed Schaible Rust Oban
2017-04-04SenateRefused to concur
2017-03-31SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2017-03-30HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 76 nays 14
2017-03-30HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-29HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 15 5 1
2017-03-13HouseCommittee Hearing 03:30
2017-02-22HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee
2017-02-21HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-20SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 4
2017-02-20SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-17SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 3 1
2017-02-08SenateCommittee Hearing 10:15
2017-02-02SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2017-02-02SenateAmendment adopted
2017-02-01SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 1 1
2017-01-23SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-01-16SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback