ND SB2242 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Signed by Governor 05/02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Signed by Governor 05/02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new subsection to section 20.1-01-02 and a new subsection to section 20.1-03-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to disabled veterans and hunting fees.
Title
Disabled veterans and hunting fees.
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Oehlke [R] | Sen. David Hogue [R] | Sen. Stanley Lyson [R] | Rep. Curt Hofstad [R] |
Rep. Dennis Johnson [R] | Rep. Bob Hunskor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor 05/02 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-04-30 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-29 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2013-04-29 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-04-25 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 0 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-04-18 | House | Conference committee appointed Silbernagel Damschen S. Kelsh |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Laffen Hogue Murphy |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2013-04-16 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 94 nays 0 |
2013-04-16 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-04-16 | House | Division B adopted |
2013-04-16 | House | Division A adopted |
2013-04-16 | House | Division of amendment |
2013-04-12 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2013-04-12 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 0 |
2013-04-11 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-03-08 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-02-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2013-02-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Natural Resources Committee |