ND 2241 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
Pending: Joint Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 23-01-37 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to review of health facility construction and renovation projects; and to provide a continuing appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Review of health facility construction and renovation projects; and to provide a continuing appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
2021-02-16HouseReceived from Senate
2021-02-15SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1
2021-02-15SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-12SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2021-01-29SenateCommittee Hearing 08:30
2021-01-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback