ND SB2241 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 23-01-41 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the autism spectrum disorder database.
Title
The autism spectrum disorder database.
Sponsors
Sen. Judy Lee [R] | Sen. Gary Lee [R] | Sen. Joan Heckaman [D] | Rep. Karen Rohr [R] |
Rep. Jay Seibel [R] | Rep. Pamela Anderson [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 46 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 1 0 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |