ND 2234 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 45
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subsection to section 54-17-07.3 and a new section to chapter 54-17 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the establishment of an essential service worker home ownership incentive program and essential service worker home ownership incentive fund; to amend and reenact subsection 3 of section 54-17-40 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the housing incentive fund; to provide an appropriation and transfer; and to provide a continuing appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The housing incentive fund; to provide an appropriation and transfer; and to provide a continuing appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-17SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 45
2017-02-16SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 0 0
2017-02-13SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-02-03SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2017-02-03SenateAmendment adopted
2017-02-02SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2017-01-23SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-01-16SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback