ND SB2233 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact chapter 27-02.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to attorney recruitment in rural counties and municipalities; to provide for a report to the legislative management; and to provide a continuing appropriation.
Title
Attorney recruitment in rural counties and municipalities; to provide for a report to the legislative management; and to provide a continuing appropriation.
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] | Sen. David Hogue [R] | Sen. Diane Larson [R] | Rep. Zachary Ista [D] |
Rep. Lawrence Klemin [R] | Rep. Shannon Roers Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 68 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 68 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/16 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Concurred |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2021-03-31 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 68 nays 25 |
2021-03-26 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 4 1 |
2021-03-05 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-02-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 1 0 |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |