ND 2232 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 1-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the annual observance of Juneteenth; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The annual observance of Juneteenth; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 70 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13SenateSigned by Governor 04/12
2021-04-09SenateSent to Governor
2021-04-09SenateSigned by President
2021-04-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-06SenateReturned to Senate
2021-04-06HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 70 nays 22, Emergency clause carried
2021-03-29HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 9 5 0
2021-03-25HouseCommittee Hearing 02:30
2021-03-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
2021-02-18HouseReceived from Senate
2021-02-17SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 3, Emergency clause carried
2021-02-15SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-12SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2021-02-11SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-01-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback