ND SB2231 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-01 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 31
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-01 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 31
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 16.1-15-32 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to publication of election results.
Title
Publication of election results.
Sponsors
Sen. Kristin Roers [R] | Sen. David Hogue [R] | Sen. Scott Meyer [R] | Rep. Scott Louser [R] |
Rep. Corey Mock [D] | Rep. Brandy Pyle [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 15 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-01 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 31 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 2 0 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |