ND 2231 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Signed by Governor 03/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 43-15-31.4 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to pharmacists limited prescriptive practices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmacists limited prescriptive practices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateSigned by Governor 03/26
2019-03-21SenateSent to Governor
2019-03-21SenateSigned by President
2019-03-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-19SenateReturned to Senate
2019-03-18HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 3
2019-03-14HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 2 0
2019-03-13HouseCommittee Hearing 03:15
2019-03-01HouseRereferred to Human Services
2019-03-01HouseRequest return from committee
2019-02-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
2019-01-29HouseReceived from Senate
2019-01-28SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0
2019-01-24SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2019-01-23SenateCommittee Hearing 11:30
2019-01-21SenateCommittee Hearing 11:00
2019-01-11SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback