ND 2231 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 26.1-08-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the comprehensive health association; to require comprehensive health association of North Dakota notification of policy holders; to provide a contingent effective date; and to provide an expiration date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The comprehensive health association; to require comprehensive health association of North Dakota notification of policy holders; to provide a contingent effective date; and to provide an expiration date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-09SenateSigned by Governor 04/09
2015-04-07SenateSent to Governor
2015-04-07SenateSigned by President
2015-04-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2015-04-02SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 1
2015-04-02SenateConcurred
2015-03-31SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2015-03-30HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 90 nays 3
2015-03-26HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2015-03-25HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0
2015-03-18HouseCommittee Hearing 02:45
2015-02-19HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
2015-01-29HouseReceived from Senate
2015-01-28SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1
2015-01-27SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 1 0
2015-01-27SenateCommittee Hearing 11:00
2015-01-16SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback