ND 2231 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-08 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 20.1-03-12, 20.1-03-12.1, and 20.1-03-12.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to hunting fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hunting fees.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-08SenateSigned by Governor 04/08
2013-04-05SenateSent to Governor
2013-04-01SenateSigned by President
2013-04-01HouseSigned by Speaker
2013-03-28SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 39 nays 6
2013-03-28SenateConcurred
2013-03-26SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2013-03-25HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 77 nays 15
2013-03-18HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2013-03-15HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 0 2
2013-03-08HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2013-02-26HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee
2013-02-22HouseReceived from Senate
2013-02-21SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 40 nays 6
2013-02-18SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 3 0
2013-02-18SenateCommittee Hearing 08:30
2013-02-12SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2013-02-11SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 4 2 1
2013-02-08SenateCommittee Hearing 10:15
2013-02-01SenateCommittee Hearing 09:15
2013-01-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Natural Resources Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback