ND 2231 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact subsections 1 and 7 of section 12.1-32-15 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the registration of sexual offenders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The registration of sexual offenders.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-28 Filed with Secretary Of State 04/27
2011-04-27 Signed by Governor 04/27
2011-04-22 Signed by President
2011-04-18 Signed by Speaker
2011-04-15 Conference committee report adopted
2011-04-13 Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede)
2011-04-13 Conference committee report adopted
2011-04-12 Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede)
2011-04-05 Conference committee appointed Brabandt Steiner Hogan
2011-03-31 Refused to concur
2011-03-21 Returned to Senate (12)
2011-03-18 Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 92 nays 0
2011-03-16 Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
2011-03-15 Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 0 3
2011-03-14 Committee Hearing 09:00
2011-02-23 Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2011-01-27 Received from Senate
2011-01-26 Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2011-01-25 Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2011-01-25 Committee Hearing 09:00
2011-01-17 Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback