ND 2231 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Filed with Secretary of State

Summary

Introduced by Rep. N. Johnson, Hofstad, Kerzman A BILL for an Act to provide for contracting with a statewide charitable food recovery and distribution organization; and to provide an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Introduced by Rep. N. Johnson, Hofstad, Kerzman A BILL for an Act to provide for contracting with a statewide charitable food recovery and distribution organization; and to provide an appropriation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-04-23 Filed with Secretary of State
2009-04-22 Signed by Governor
2009-04-20 Sent to Governor
2009-04-20 Signed by President
2009-04-07 Signed by Speaker
2009-04-02 Returned to Senate
2009-04-02 Second reading, passed, yeas 054 nays 037
2009-03-24 Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 016 n 008
2009-03-13 Rereferred to Appropriations
2009-03-12 Committee Hearing 09:00
2009-02-17 Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions
2009-02-16 Received from Senate
2009-02-13 Second reading, passed, yeas 034 nays 012
2009-02-10 Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 007 n 005
2009-02-04 Committee Hearing 11:15
2009-01-29 Committee Hearing 10:30
2009-01-19 Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback