ND 2230 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Committee Hearing 09:00
Pending: Joint Agriculture Committee
Hearing: Mar 11 @ 9:00 am in Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 6-09.7-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the use of the strategic investment and improvements fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The use of the strategic investment and improvements fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-11HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-02-24HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee
2021-02-18HouseReceived from Senate
2021-02-17SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2021-02-12SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-11SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
2021-02-03SenateCommittee Hearing 08:30
2021-01-28SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2021-01-28SenateReported back, do pass 6 0 0
2021-01-28SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2021-01-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback