ND SB2222 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-29 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 7 nays 39
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-29 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 7 nays 39
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact chapter 26.1-36.8 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to requirements of health insurance policies; to amend and reenact section 50-24.1-37 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to continuation of Medicaid Expansion; to repeal sections 40 and 41 of chapter 11 of the 2017 Session Laws, relating to repeal of the Medicaid Expansion program; to provide for application; and to provide a contingent effective date.
Title
Repeal of the Medicaid Expansion program; to provide for application; and to provide a contingent effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Mathern [D] | Sen. Richard Marcellais [D] | Rep. Pamela Anderson [D] | Rep. George Keiser [R] |
Rep. Austen Schauer [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 7 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 7 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 7 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-29 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 7 nays 39 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Division B lost |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Division A lost |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Division of bill |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Laid over one legislative day |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 1 0 |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |