ND SB2222 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 12.1-36-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to female genital mutilation; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Female genital mutilation; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Janne Myrdal [R] | Sen. Joan Heckaman [D] | Rep. Pamela Anderson [D] | Rep. Terry Jones [R] |
Rep. Kim Koppelman [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/10 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Concurred |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2019-03-27 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 90 nays 0 |
2019-03-22 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-21 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-03-05 | House | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 1 0 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |