ND 2222 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 12.1-36-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to female genital mutilation; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Female genital mutilation; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11SenateSigned by Governor 04/10
2019-04-05SenateSent to Governor
2019-04-05SenateSigned by President
2019-04-05HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-04-03SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2019-04-03SenateConcurred
2019-03-28SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2019-03-27HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 90 nays 0
2019-03-22HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-03-21HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
2019-03-05HouseCommittee Hearing 10:45
2019-02-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
2019-02-01HouseReceived from Senate
2019-01-31SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0
2019-01-30SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 1 0
2019-01-29SenateCommittee Hearing 10:15
2019-01-11SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback