ND SB2222 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Signed by Governor 03/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Signed by Governor 03/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 21-02-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to uncollected taxes.
Title
Uncollected taxes.
Sponsors
Sen. Donald Schaible [R] | Sen. Kelly Armstrong [R] | Sen. Dwight Cook [R] | Rep. Tom Kading [R] |
Rep. Karen Rohr [R] | Rep. James Schmidt [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/13 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2017-03-03 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 0 |
2017-03-01 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2017-03-01 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |