ND 2221 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Motion to reconsider failed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact section 53-06.2-10.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to historic horse race wagering; and to amend and reenact sections 50-06-22, 53-06.2-01, 53-06.2-04, 53-06.2-05, and 53-06.2-06, subsection 1 of section 53-06.2-08, and sections 53-06.2-10, 53-06.2-10.1, and 53-06.2-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the compulsive gambling prevention and treatment fund and the regulation of historic horse racing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The compulsive gambling prevention and treatment fund and the regulation of historic horse racing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 45 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-05HouseMotion to reconsider failed
2017-04-04HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 45 nays 46
2017-04-04HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-04-03HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 9 2
2017-03-22HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2017-03-22HouseReported back, do pass 8 7 0
2017-03-15HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-02-22HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2017-02-20HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-16SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 30 nays 15
2017-02-16SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-15SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0
2017-02-14SenateRereferred to Judiciary
2017-02-08SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-02-01SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2017-02-01SenateReported back, do pass 4 2 0
2017-01-31SenateCommittee Hearing 02:30
2017-01-17SenateRereferred to Judiciary
2017-01-17SenateRequest return from committee
2017-01-13SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback