ND SB2221 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Rep. Belter, Heller, Pinkerton A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subsection to section 57-60-01 and section 57-60-02.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a credit against privilege taxes on coal conversion facilities for carbon dioxide capture; to amend and reenact section 57-60-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to measurement and recording of carbon dioxide capture; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Introduced by Rep. Belter, Heller, Pinkerton A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subsection to section 57-60-01 and section 57-60-02.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a credit against privilege taxes on coal conversion facilities for carbon dioxide capture; to amend and reenact section 57-60-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to measurement and recording of carbon dioxide capture; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-23 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-22 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-14 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-13 | Returned to Senate | |
2009-04-13 | Second reading, passed, yeas 093 nays 000 | |
2009-04-10 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 022 n 000 | |
2009-03-11 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-03-10 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation | |
2009-02-19 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-18 | Motion to reconsider laid on table | |
2009-02-18 | Second reading, passed, yeas 045 nays 001 | |
2009-02-17 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-16 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 013 n 000 | |
2009-02-13 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-02-11 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 013 n 000 | |
2009-02-10 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2009-02-06 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-02-06 | Amendment adopted | |
2009-02-05 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 007 n 000 | |
2009-01-28 | Committee Hearing 09:45 | |
2009-01-14 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2221.html |