ND SB2220 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-07 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 32
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-07 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 32
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 61-32-03.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to permitting of subsurface water management systems by water resource district boards.
Title
Permitting of subsurface water management systems by water resource district boards.
Sponsors
Sen. Larry Luick [R] | Sen. Jim Dotzenrod [D] | Sen. Arne Osland [R] | Rep. Craig Johnson [R] |
Sen. Jeffery Magrum [R] | Rep. Alisa Mitskog [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 14 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 32 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 4 2 0 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |