ND SB2220 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-31 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 10 nays 36
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-31 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 10 nays 36
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 15.1-27-23 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the authority to waive rescheduling of make up days for weather-related school closures.
Title
The authority to waive rescheduling of make up days for weather-related school closures.
Sponsors
Sen. Janne Myrdal [R] | Sen. Curtiss Kreun [R] | Rep. Rick Becker [R] | Rep. Kathy Skroch [R] |
Rep. Marvin Nelson [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 10 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-31 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 10 nays 36 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 0 1 |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |