ND SB2219 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 45
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 45
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the department of commerce to provide funding for research-based literacy intervention services to students.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the department of commerce to provide funding for research-based literacy intervention services to students.
Sponsors
Sen. Kyle Davison [R] | Sen. Jay Elkin [R] | Sen. Nicole Poolman [R] | Rep. Cynthia Schreiber-Beck [R] |
Rep. Michelle Strinden [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 1 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 45 |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |