ND SB2219 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-28 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 29
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-28 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 29
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact section 51-22-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the confidentiality of social security numbers; to amend and reenact sections 51-22-01, 51-22-02, and 51-22-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to data processing information confidentiality; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Data processing information confidentiality; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Mathern [D] | Sen. Jerry Klein [R] | Rep. William Devlin [R] | Rep. James Kasper [R] |
Rep. Karen Rohr [R] | Rep. Bernie Satrom [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 16 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 29 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |