ND SB2217 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-07 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 10 nays 34
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-07 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 10 nays 34
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 53-06.1-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to gaming tax deposits and allocations.
Title
Gaming tax deposits and allocations.
Sponsors
Sen. Merrill Piepkorn [D] | Sen. Dick Dever [R] | Sen. Richard Marcellais [D] | Rep. Karen Karls [R] |
Rep. Mary Johnson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 10 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 10 nays 34 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 1 0 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |