ND 2215 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 15.1-16-06 and 15.1-16-10, subsection 1 of section 15.1-16-11, section 15.1-16-13, subsection 1 of section 15.1-16-14, and sections 15.1-16-15 and 15.1-16-18 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to deadlines for teacher negotiations between school districts and representative organizations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Deadlines for teacher negotiations between school districts and representative organizations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 63 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13SenateSigned by Governor 04/12
2021-04-09SenateSent to Governor
2021-04-09SenateSigned by President
2021-04-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-06SenateReturned to Senate
2021-04-06HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 63 nays 29
2021-03-30HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 3 0
2021-03-17HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-02-24HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
2021-02-17HouseReceived from Senate
2021-02-16SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 37 nays 10
2021-02-15SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-12SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 2 0
2021-02-02SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2021-01-14SenateIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback