ND SB2215 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor 04/30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor 04/30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 15.1-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the creation of the kindergarten through grade twelve education coordination council; to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 28-32-01, and subsection 1 of section 54-59-33 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the definition of administrative agency, and the statewide longitudinal data system committee; and to repeal sections 54-59-17 and 54-59-18 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the educational technology council.
Title
The educational technology council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 73 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 70 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 70 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/30 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-24 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 73 nays 20 |
2019-04-24 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-23 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-08 | House | Conference committee appointed Owens Schreiber-Beck Hager |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Davison Schaible Oban |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2019-03-29 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 70 nays 17 |
2019-03-28 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-27 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-03-12 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |
2019-02-08 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |