ND 2212 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 47-16-39.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the inspection of production and royalty payment records by the board of university and school lands; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The inspection of production and royalty payment records by the board of university and school lands; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11SenateSigned by Governor 04/10
2019-04-08SenateSent to Governor
2019-04-08SenateSigned by President
2019-04-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-04-04SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2019-04-04SenateConcurred
2019-04-01SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2019-04-01HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 85 nays 3
2019-04-01HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-03-29HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
2019-03-07HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2019-02-27HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee
2019-02-18HouseReceived from Senate
2019-02-15SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0
2019-02-15SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-02-14SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2019-01-31SenateCommittee Hearing 02:30
2019-01-11SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback