ND SB2211 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 13 nays 79
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 13 nays 79
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 20.1-01-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to use of artificial light while hunting.
Title
Use of artificial light while hunting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 13 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 28 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 28 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 13 nays 79 |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-03-05 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 28 nays 19 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |