ND SB2210 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Signed by Governor 04/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Signed by Governor 04/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact subsection 5 of section 10-06.1-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to filing requirements with the secretary of state; and to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 10-01.1-08, sections 10-06.1-04, 10-06.1-05, 10-06.1-12, 10-06.1-15, 10-06.1-17, and 10-06.1-23, subsection 1 of section 10-15-42, subsection 4 of section 10-15-53.1, subsection 3 of section 10-32.1-89, subsections 1 and 2 of section 10-32.1-102, subdivision a of subsection 3 of section 10-33-01, section 10-33-13, subsection 3 of section 10-33-139, subsection 3 of section 10-36-07, sections 26.1-12.1-13, 40-04-06, and 43-54-03, subsection 3 of section 45-10.2-108, section 45-11-08.2, subsection 3 of section 45-22-21.1, sections 47-22-08 and 47-25-07, and subsection 1 of section 50-22-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to filing requirements with the secretary of state.
Title
Filing requirements with the secretary of state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/01 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-31 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2021-03-26 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0 |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2021-03-22 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-02-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2021-01-29 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 2 |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |