ND 2209 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 22 nays 69
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 19-02.1 and a new chapter to title 19 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to increased access to low-cost prescription drugs; to amend and reenact section 43-15.3-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to drug wholesaler fees; to provide for a report; to provide a continuing appropriation; to provide for a transfer; and to provide a contingent effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Drug wholesaler fees; to provide for a report; to provide a continuing appropriation; to provide for a transfer; and to provide a contingent effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 22 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 22 nays 69
2021-04-05HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 1 0
2021-03-09HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2021-02-19HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
2021-02-15HouseReceived from Senate
2021-02-12SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 35 nays 12
2021-02-10SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-09SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0
2021-01-27SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-01-14SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback