ND SB2208 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Signed by Governor 03/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Signed by Governor 03/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 23-06-03 and 23-06-31 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to authority to and immunity for disposition of the dead.
Title
Authority to and immunity for disposition of the dead.
Sponsors
Sen. Judy Lee [R] | Sen. Tim Mathern [D] | Sen. Kristin Roers [R] | Rep. Mike Nathe [R] |
Rep. Cynthia Schreiber-Beck [R] | Rep. Bill Tveit [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/20 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2019-03-12 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2019-03-07 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-03-05 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2019-01-25 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |